Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS v. US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00994
Date Filed2022-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffINDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS
Case DescriptionThe Indiana Federal Community Defenders submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning Jurijus Kadamovas, who had been sentenced to death for murder in California. The requests focused on an attempted escape from MDC Los Angeles on March 7, 2003. The FBI responded to IFCD's requests by indicating that it had found no records. IFCD appealed that response. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency as to any of its requests, IFCD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. MARSHALS SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
Complaint attachment 33
Complaint attachment 34
Complaint attachment 35
Complaint attachment 36
Complaint attachment 37
Complaint attachment 38
Complaint attachment 39
Complaint attachment 40
Complaint attachment 41
Complaint attachment 42
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Civil Cover Sheet, # 38 Summons, # 39 Summons, # 40 Summons, # 41 Summons, # 42 Summons)(Patti, Florence) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-13Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmh) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-132SUMMONS(5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-13NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to italia_patti@fd.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-143STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 14, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-144REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Patti, Florence) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-195REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Patti, Florence) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-196ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Florence Italia Patti on behalf of INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS (Patti, Florence) Modified on 4/19/2022 (zeg). (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-19NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 6 Notice of Appearance. The following error(s) need correction: Invalid attorney signature- signature on document must match PACER login. Please refile. (zeg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-197NOTICE of Appearance by Josh Pickar on behalf of INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS (Pickar, Josh) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-198SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-05-169RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 4/25/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/25/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2022.) (Patti, Florence) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-1610RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 4/22/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/25/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL served on 4/28/2022; U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE served on 4/25/2022. (See Docket Entry 9 to view document) (zjf) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-2511NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of All Defendants (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-2512ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE.(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-2513Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE.. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar