Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00997
Date Filed2022-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffINDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS
Case DescriptionIndiana Federal Community Defenders submitted FOIA requests to the FBI, U.S. Marshals Service, and the Department of Justice's Office of Inspector General for records concerning investigations of drug trafficking allegations at MDC Los Angeles in 2003. All three components acknowledged receipt of the requests. USMS told IFCD that it found no records while the FBI and OIG told IFCD that its requests qualified for the unusual circumstances processing track. IFCD filed an administrative appeal of the USMS's response. After hearing nothing more from any of the agencies, IFCD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. MARSHALS SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Civil Cover Sheet, # 17 Summons, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons, # 20 Summons)(Patti, Florence) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-13Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmh) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-132SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-13NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to italia_patti@fd.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-143ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Patti, Florence); Modified on 4/15/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-15NOTICE OF ERROR re 3 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to italia_patti@fd.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed , 2. Please prepare summonses naming the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (ztth, ) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-184REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Patti, Florence) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-195SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (ztth) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-196ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Florence Italia Patti on behalf of INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS (Patti, Florence) Modified on 4/19/2022 (zeg). (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-19NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 6 Notice of Appearance. The following error(s) need correction: Invalid attorney signature- signature on document must match PACER login. Please refile. (zeg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-197NOTICE of Appearance by Josh Pickar on behalf of INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS (Pickar, Josh) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-05-168RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/2/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/27/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/27/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/27/2022.) (Patti, Florence) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar