Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01000
Date Filed2022-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffINDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS
Case DescriptionIndiana Federal Community Defenders submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice's Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concern the search to fill the position of U.S. Attorney for the Central District of California after the resignation of Debra Wong Yang on November 11, 2006. EOUSA referred the request to the Office of Information Policy. OIP acknowledged receipt of the request and told IFCD that it could find no responsive records. IFCD filed an administrative appeal. OIP upheld its original decision. IFCD then submitted new FOIA requests about the Yong Wang incident that were broader in scope. EOUSA and OIP acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, IFCD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
DefendantOFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Civil Cover Sheet, # 22 Summons, # 23 Summons, # 24 Summons)(Patti, Florence) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-142ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Patti, Florence) Modified on 4/15/2022 SUMMONSES FILED INCORRECTLY BY COUNSEL (zmh). (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-15Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmh) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-154STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/15/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-15NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to italia_patti@fd.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-155REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Patti, Florence) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-156SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) . Modified on 4/15/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-197ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Florence Italia Patti on behalf of INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS (Patti, Florence) Modified on 4/19/2022 (zeg). (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-19NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 7 Notice of Appearance. The following error(s) need correction: Invalid attorney signature- signature on document must match PACER login. Please refile. (zeg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-198NOTICE of Appearance by Josh Pickar on behalf of INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS (Pickar, Josh) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-05-169RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS served on 4/25/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/25/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2022.) (Patti, Florence) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-1610RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/25/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY served on 4/25/2022. (See Docket Entry 9 to view document) (zjf) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/24/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-1811Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-1812NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of All Defendants (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-19MINUTE ORDER granting the 11 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants' responsive pleading is now due on or before June 24, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/19/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar