Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00986
Date Filed2022-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning funding provided by DHS related to the Domestic Surveillance Strategy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated that it was processing it. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, AFL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE AND ANALYSIS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE AND ANALYSIS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9162298) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubinstein, Reed) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-12Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-122SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-05-093NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE AND ANALYSIS (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-094Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE AND ANALYSIS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-10MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent 4 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by June 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/10/22. (DJS) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/15/2022. (tb) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-115NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ding on behalf of AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar