Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00988
Date Filed2022-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning unpaid liabilities owned to the Department during specific periods. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-9162902) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to DC USAO, # 3 Summons to U.S. Department of Education, # 4 Summons to USAG)(Zibel, Daniel) Modified defendant on 4/14/2022 (znmw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/15/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Zibel, Daniel) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/14/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-14Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/22/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/22/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/22/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 4/21/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Zibel, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-195ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar