Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBridenhagen v. Defense Intelligence Agecy et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2022cv01871
Date Filed2022-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Matthew F. Kennelly
PlaintiffJohn Bridenhagen
Case DescriptionJohn Bridenhagen submitted a FOIA request to the Defense Intelligence Agency for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the records and asked for more information. Bridenhagen provided more information but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bridenhagen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDefense Intelligence Agecy
Service List
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-111RECEIVED Complaint by John Bridenhagen. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-112CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-113APPLICATION by Plaintiff John Bridenhagen for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-114MOTION by Plaintiff John Bridenhagen for attorney representation. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-115PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff John Bridenhagen. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-11CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-11CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached Consent To form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-05-186MOTION by Plaintiff John Bridenhagen for leave to file Affidavit in support of Attorney Representation. (Attachments). (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-197MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file affidavit 6 is granted. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar