Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOakes v. United States Department of Defense
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv02973
Date Filed2022-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis J. Liman
PlaintiffCameron Oakes
Case DescriptionCameron Oakes, a freelance journalist, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning contracts and proposals related to the recruitment process. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing substantive in response to her requests, Oakes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-111COMPLAINT against United States Department of Defense. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25991501)Document filed by Cameron Oakes..(Baldino, Raymond) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-12***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Raymond Baldino. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-12CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-12Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-12Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-132CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Baldino, Raymond) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-143REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Cameron Oakes..(Baldino, Raymond) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-154ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense..(lal) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-05-205NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on June 30, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to the conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify Defendant of this Notice. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 6/30/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/20/22) (yv) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-256NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of United States Department of Defense..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-257LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 5/25/2022. Document filed by United States Department of Defense..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar