Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOakes v. United States Department of Health And Human Services
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv02975
Date Filed2022-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Valerie E. Caproni
PlaintiffCameron Oakes
Case DescriptionCameron Oakes, a freelance journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning communications addressed to Acting Deputy for Health Information Privacy Timothy Noonan from 6/1/2020 to the present containing the terms plasma and HIPAA. Oakes also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Oakes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Health And Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [12]
Opinion/Order [13]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-111COMPLAINT against United States Department of Health And Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25991692)Document filed by Cameron Oakes..(Baldino, Raymond) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-12***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Raymond Baldino. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-12CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-12Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-12Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-132CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Baldino, Raymond) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-133NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 2975. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/13/2022) (tg) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-144REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Cameron Oakes..(Baldino, Raymond) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-155ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Health And Human Services..(lal) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-05-316ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Health And Human Services..(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-077LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Raymond M. Baldino dated June 7, 2022 re: Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Cameron Oakes..(Baldino, Raymond) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-078MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 7 Letter filed by Cameron Oakes. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part. The Initial Pre-Trial Conference currently scheduled for June 17, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. is hereby ADJOURNED sine die, and the parties need not file a Case Management Plan. The parties must file a status update not later than September 1, 2022 regarding whether a pre-trial conference would be beneficial. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/7/2022) (jca) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-09-019STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report Document filed by United States Department of Health And Human Services..(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-0210MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 9 Status Report filed by United States Department of Health And Human Services. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request for a case management conference is hereby GRANTED. The parties must appear for a status conference on Friday, September 23, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, located at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/2/2022) (jca) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-02Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (jca) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-2111CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lara K. Eshkenazi dated 09/21/22. Document filed by United States Department of Health And Human Services..(Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-2112ORDER granting 11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The status conference previously scheduled for Friday, September 23, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby adjourned until Friday, September 30, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 9/30/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/21/2022) (tg) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-3013ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that for the reasons stated at the conference, Defendant is not required to produce a rolling Vaughn index, see Vaughn v. Rosen, 484 F.2d 820 (D.C. Cir. 1973). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must submit a joint status report on Thursday, December 1, 2022, and on the first business day of the month every three months thereafter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/30/2022) (tg) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-30Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Status Conference held on 9/30/2022. Attorney Raymond Baldino present for the plaintiff. AUSA Dominicka Tarcynska present for the defendant. Court Reporter Eve Giniger present. (anc) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-12-0114STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of Health And Human Services..(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar