Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFDRELANDSVENNEN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01013
Date Filed2022-04-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Florence Y. Pan
PlaintiffFDRELANDSVENNEN
Case DescriptionFaedrelandvennen, a news organization based in Norway, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records between the State Department and the U.S. Embassy in Oslo regarding Batservice Mandal and Batservice Iran from 2010 until April 2019. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Faedrelandvennen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9165781) filed by FDRELANDSVENNEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-3, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-122NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of FDRELANDSVENNEN (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-123NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of FDRELANDSVENNEN (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-14Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zmh) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-144SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-145STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 4/14/2022. (lcrl) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-05-256ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-257ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report proposing a schedule for litigation of this case on or before June 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/25/2022. (lcrl) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar