Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA POLITICAL VICTORY FUND et al v. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01017
Date Filed2022-04-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffNATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA POLITICAL VICTORY FUND
PlaintiffNATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Case DescriptionThe National Rifle Association submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Election Commission for records concerning matters under review pertaining to several suits brought against the NRA alleging illegal campaign contributions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed some responsive records but also withheld more than 30,000 pages under Exemption 5 (privileges). The NRA filed an administrative appeal to the FEC but after the agency told the NRA it was unable to resolve its appeal, the NRA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-121COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9166659) filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA POLITICAL VICTORY FUND, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Related Case Form, # 3 Summons, # 4 A, # 5 B, # 6 C, # 7 D, # 8 E, # 9 F, # 10 G, # 11 H, # 12 I, # 13 J, # 14 K, # 15 L, # 16 M)(Spies, Charles) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-124NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA POLITICAL VICTORY FUND. Case related to Case No. 21-cv-2887. (zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA POLITICAL VICTORY FUND (Spies, Charles) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-133LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA (Spies, Charles) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-14Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-155SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjf) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/18/2022. (Spies, Charles) Modified on 4/19/2022 to correct party served (USAG) (zjf). (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-197RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION served on 4/18/2022 (Spies, Charles) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-198ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 4/18/2022. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 5/9/2022. (Spies, Charles) Modified on 4/19/2022 (zjf). (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-199MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rock A. Wood, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9180414. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA POLITICAL VICTORY FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Spies, Charles) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-19NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 8 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect event. Please refile using the event, Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney. (zjf) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-1910RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/18/2022. (Spies, Charles) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-05-04MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Rock A. Wood is hereby admitted pro hac vice to this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/4/2022. (lcegs1) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-1811NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Deeley on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Deeley, Kevin) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-1812NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Jacobs Summers on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Summers, Harry) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-1813NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory John Mueller on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Mueller, Gregory) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-1814ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION.(Mueller, Gregory) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-2315STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/23/22. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar