Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPARACINO PLLC v. DEFENSE THREAT REDUCTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01028
Date Filed2022-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffSPARACINO PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Sparacino, PLLC, which represents U.S. military veterans and their families who were killed or injured in Iraq because for support for terrorism by Iran, submitted a FOIA request to the Defense Threat Reduction Agency for records concerning 200 servicemembers killed or injured in Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Sparacino PLLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEFENSE THREAT REDUCTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-131COMPLAINT for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against DEFENSE THREAT REDUCTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9168833) filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Defense Threat Reduction Agency, # 3 Summons to United States Attorney General, # 4 Summons to Civil Process Clerk - United States Attorney's Office, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 3 to Complaint)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SPARACINO PLLC (Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-14Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE THREAT REDUCTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-214Case randomly reassigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. Judge Carl J. Nichols is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-05-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEFENSE THREAT REDUCTION AGENCY served on 4/29/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/25/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/28/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/28/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-178NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas M.H. Reddick on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Reddick, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-179NOTICE of Appearance by Devin Charles Ringger on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Ringger, Devin) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-1710NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Ryan on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Ryan, Timothy) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar