Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01033
Date Filed2022-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a multi-part FOIA request to the Indian Health Service, a component of the Department of Health and Human Services, for records concerning communications between the Office of Community Relations in response to a letter sent by the Phoenix Indian Medical Center Staff from Acting CEO Holly Elliott on or around September 21, 2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked Judicial Watch to narrow the scope of its request, which it did. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9169151) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-14Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/25/22. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/25/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-05-257NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-258ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar