Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01034
Date Filed2022-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a two-part FOIA request to FBI for records concerning communications between the agency and the New York Times pertaining to the raid of the home of the founder of Project Veritas in Mamaroneck, NY. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and divided it into two requests. The FBI denied the request under Exemption 7 (A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Judicial Watch filed administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy. OIP upheld the FBI's denial. Judicial Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9169224) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 4 Summons for US Attorney General, # 5 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-14Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-143STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 14, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-194SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/26/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/26/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/25/22. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/25/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-05-058NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-249ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar