Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01035
Date Filed2022-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between the FBI or the FBI New York Field Office and employees of Pfizer, Inc. regarding Project Veritas founder James O'Keefe. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and divided the request into two requests. The agency issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records for both requests. Judicial Watch filed administrative appeals to the Office of Information Policy. OIP upheld the denial for both requests. Judicial Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9169291) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2022)
2022-04-14Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/25/22. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/25/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-05-057NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-238ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar