Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMURALI v. U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01044
Date Filed2022-04-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffMICHAEL MURALI
Case DescriptionMichael Murali, an attorney representing Abu Faraj-al-Libi pro bono through the Military Commissions Defense Organization, submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Southern Command, the Department of Defense, the CIA, the Department of State, the FBI, and the Department of Justice for records concerning al-Libi's medical records. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. U.S. Southern Command disclosed some records but withheld the majority of them. After none of the agencies substantively responded to Murali's requests, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-141COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9170724) filed by MICHAEL MURALI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-11, # 2 Exhibit Ex 12-23, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-142SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MICHAEL MURALI(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-143NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of MICHAEL MURALI (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-144NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of MICHAEL MURALI (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-14Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-195SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-216STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 21, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-05-047NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 4/25/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-119RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND served on 4/26/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-1110RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/25/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-1111RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/20/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-1112RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 4/25/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-1113RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 4/26/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-1114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/26/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/26/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-1115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/26/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-2316NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-2317MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar