Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTEINER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01045
Date Filed2022-04-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffRICHARD STEINER
Case DescriptionRichard Steiner submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning an application from Marine Scientific Research to conduct marine research in U.S. waters of the North Pacific. Steiner also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated that it was processing it. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Steiner filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-141COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9171009) filed by RICHARD STEINER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for State, # 3 Summons for US AG, # 4 Summons for US Att DC)(Kingston, Hudson) Modified on 4/15/2022 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-15Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (znmg) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-05-034ERRATA to Summons for Agency Defendant by RICHARD STEINER re 1 Complaint,. (Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-095SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (znmw) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-166NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-237ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-23MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/23/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar