Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01046
Date Filed2022-04-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtecting the Public's Trust submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Interior for records concerning planning and preparation for Secretary Haaland's August 2021 wedding. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-141COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9171055) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA DOI-SOL-2021-005830, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - FOIA DOI-OS-2021-005829, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 5 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons Summons - DOI Solicitor)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-15Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(ztth) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-05-203NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-254ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar