Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01050
Date Filed2022-04-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted 7 FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning institutions that had been recertified to participate in Title IV HEA programs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing more substantive from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, Student Defense filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9171979) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DC USAO, # 3 Summons ED, # 4 Summons USAG)(Goldman, Emily) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Goldman, Emily) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/18/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-18Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmh) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-194ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/19/22. (DM) (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/25/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 4/25/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Goldman, Emily) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-05-256NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-257ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar