Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01066
Date Filed2022-04-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning cable/teletypes and emails sent via the SMART system that reference Hunter Biden. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9174945) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of State)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-18Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsb) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjf) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-04-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/25/22. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/25/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-05-257NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Samuel Bloch Newman on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Newman, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-258ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Newman, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar