Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCommunity Justice Exchange et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2022cv02328
Date Filed2022-04-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffCommunity Justice Exchange
PlaintiffMijente Support Committee
PlaintiffJust Futures Law
Case DescriptionThe Community Justice Exchange, Just Futures Law, and the Mijente Support Committee submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's use of B.I., Inc.'s SmartLINK Application for the Intensive Supervision Appearance Program. The requesters also asked for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the requesters filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-141COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17085714.). Filed byCommunity Justice Exchange, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crump, Catherine) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-142Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/28/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-153Proposed Summons. (Crump, Catherine) (Filed on 4/15/2022) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-154Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-155Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-286CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Community Justice Exchange, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee.. (Crump, Catherine) (Filed on 4/28/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-287SUMMONS Returned Executed by Community Justice Exchange, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/21/2022. (Crump, Catherine) (Filed on 4/28/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-288SUMMONS Returned Executed by Community Justice Exchange, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/21/2022. (Crump, Catherine) (Filed on 4/28/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-05-139CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2022 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar . Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings hel d by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1 3/2022) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
2022-05-2310DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/23/2022) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar