Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBermudez v. U S Dept of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review
DistrictWestern District of Louisiana
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2022cv01032
Date Filed2022-04-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Elizabeth E Foote
PlaintiffEmanuel Luzardo Bermudez
Case DescriptionEmanuel Luzardo Bermudez submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice's Executive Office for Immigration Review for records concerning his immigration removal proceeding case file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Luzardo Bermudez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU S Dept of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-191COMPLAINT against U S Dept of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5073347) filed by Emanuel Luzardo Bermudez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil cover sheet, # 2 Proposed summons/writ, # 3 Proposed summons/writ, # 4 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Michael Wayne Gahagan added to party Emanuel Luzardo Bermudez(pty:pla))(aty,Gahagan, Michael) Modified docket text on 4/20/2022 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-19CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-202SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Secretary of Dept of Homeland Security. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-213ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/21/2022. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-05-104SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emanuel Luzardo Bermudez U S Dept of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review served on 5/2/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(aty,Gahagan, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-06-015First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Emanuel Luzardo Bermudez. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of material facts, # 2 Memorandum / Brief, # 3 Proposed order, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(aty,Gahagan, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
2022-06-026NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: 5 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-027NOTICE of Appearance by Desiree C Williams on behalf of U S Dept of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review (Attorney Desiree C Williams added to party U S Dept of Justice Executive Office for Immigration Review(pty:dft)) (aty,Williams, Desiree) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar