Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDicus v. Kijakazi
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityPhoenix Division
Case Number2:2022cv00654
Date Filed2022-04-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Michelle H Burns
PlaintiffKathryn Dicus
Case DescriptionKathryn Dicus submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for names, job titles, and direct phone numbers of employees of the Arizona SSA field offices. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency only released identifying information on district manager level employees. Dicus then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantCommissioner of Social Security Administration
DefendantKilolo Kijakazi Social Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-201COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20577782 filed by Kathryn Dicus. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(BAC) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-202SUMMONS Submitted by Kathryn Dicus. (Dicus, Kathryn) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(BAC) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-203Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20577782. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00654-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-204Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-206Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-05-187First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Piensook, Kwan) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-188Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-209ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) . Kilolo Kijakazi answer due 6/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 5/20/2022. (LAD) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-2511Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-2612Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar