Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Foundation for Government Accountability v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityFt. Myers
Case Number2:2022cv00252
Date Filed2022-04-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John L. Badalamenti
PlaintiffThe Foundation for Government Accountability
Case DescriptionThe Foundation for Government Accountability submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the agency's plans to implement a new E.O. on promoting voting rights. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FGA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-201COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19478645) filed by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Summons, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shapiro, Daniel) Modified on 4/21/2022, to edit duplicate docket text. (SPB). (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-202NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-252-JLB-MRM. (NAS) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-203NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Shapiro on behalf of The Foundation for Government Accountability (Shapiro, Daniel) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-204MOTION for Jeffrey M. Harris to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19479000 for $150 by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Shapiro, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-205ORDER granting 4 Motion for Jeffrey M. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . The Clerk of Court is directed to add Jeffrey M. Harris to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jeffrey M. Harris must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Jeffrey M. Harris must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/20/2022. (CM) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-216NOTICE to counsel Frank H. Chang Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-217CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/21/2022. (SPB) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-218NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-22REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-19478604 refunded in the amount of $ $402.00 paid to Daniel J Shapiro. (NLC) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-229CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Harris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-2210NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeffrey M. Harris on behalf of The Foundation for Government Accountability. Lead Counsel: Jeffrey M. Harris. (Harris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-2211PROPOSED summons to be issued by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Attachments: # 1 AG, # 2 USAO)(Harris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-2212SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SPB) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-2913PROOF of service as to Department of Justice served on 4/25/2022 by The Foundation for Government Accountability (Harris,Jeffrey) Modified on 5/2/2022, to edit service details. (SPB). (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-0314MOTION for Frank H. Chang to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19525936 for $150 by The Foundation for Government Accountability. (Harris, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-0315ORDER granting 14 Motion for Frank H. Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice . The Clerk of Court is directed to add Frank H. Chang to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Frank H. Chang must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Frank H. Chang must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/3/2022. (CM) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-0316NOTICE of compliance re 6 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by The Foundation for Government Accountability (Chang, Frank) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-2317NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-2318ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Justice.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar