Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNAFKHA v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01102
Date Filed2022-04-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffMOUNIR NAFKHA
Case DescriptionMounir Nafkha submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning videos of his assault by Officer Roque in the Krome North recreation yard. Nafkha also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and granted Nafkha's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Nafkha filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-211COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9186897) filed by MOUNIR NAFKHA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed)(Kenney, Mary) Modified on 4/22/2022 to edit docket text (zjm). (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-212MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Trina Realmuto, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9188157. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MOUNIR NAFKHA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenney, Mary) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-22NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to mary@immigrationlitigation.org, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Exhibits should not be combined with the main document; they should be added as attachments. No action is required at this time. (zjm, ) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-22Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zjm) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-22MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of TRINA REALMUTO. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/22/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-254NOTICE of Appearance by Trina Ann Realmuto on behalf of MOUNIR NAFKHA (Realmuto, Trina) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-05-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/2/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/1/2022. (Realmuto, Trina) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-036RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/2/2022. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 5/2/2022. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document) (ztth) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-237NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-318Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-01MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer by July 1, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/1/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
2022-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/1/2022. (znbn) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar