Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01106
Date Filed2022-04-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning communications between NARA and federal agencies regarding the frequency with which federal agencies request and engage in destruction of records. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-211COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9186751) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons NARA, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-21Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmh) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-224STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/22/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-05-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/2/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/1/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 5/2/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/2/22. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-06-016NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
2022-06-017ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
2022-06-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that, on or before July 1, 2022, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference on July 7, 2022, at 9:30 a.m., before Judge Randolph D. Moss. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/3/2022. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar