Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Associated Press et al v. United States Central Command
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv03268
Date Filed2022-04-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lorna G. Schofield
PlaintiffThe Associated Press
PlaintiffEric Tucker
Case DescriptionThe Associated Press submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Central Command for records concerning body cam and overhead video of the February 3, 2022 USCENTCOM raid in which Abu Ibrahim al-Hashimi al Quarayshi was killed. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the AP that its request was number 3,440 in the agency's backlog. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the AP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Central Command
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-211COMPLAINT against United States Central Command. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26040948)Document filed by The Associated Press, Eric Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B).(Barrett, Brian) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-212CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barrett, Brian) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-213FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Attorney General of the United States, United States Attorney for the Southern District of N.Y., United States Central Command, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The Associated Press, Eric Tucker..(Barrett, Brian) Modified on 4/22/2022 (sj). (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-214RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Associated Press..(Barrett, Brian) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-22CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(sj) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-22Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (sj) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-22Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-22***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brian Patrick Barrett to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant as to whom the summons request is for must be listed in "To" field on PDF and in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-225REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Central Command, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The Associated Press, Eric Tucker..(Barrett, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-226REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Central Command, c/o U.S. Attorney for the S.D.N.Y., re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The Associated Press, Eric Tucker..(Barrett, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-227REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Central Command, c/o Atty. Gen. of the U.S., re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The Associated Press, Eric Tucker..(Barrett, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-228ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Central Command. (vf) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-229ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Central Command. (vf) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-2210ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Central Command. (vf) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-26NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Paul G. Gardephe is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-05-0411AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. United States Central Command served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. Service was accepted by Derick Mayer. Document filed by The Associated Press; Eric Tucker..(Barrett, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-0612ORDER: Initial Conference by telephone set for 6/29/2022 at 4:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/6/2022) (vfr) Modified on 5/12/2022 (vfr). (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-1213NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jean-David Barnea on behalf of United States Central Command..(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
2022-05-2514CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Scheduling Order & Individual Rules and Procedures served on Jean-David Barnea on 05/24/2022. Document filed by The Associated Press, Eric Tucker..(Barrett, Brian) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-2515ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Central Command..(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar