Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHooker v. Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2022cv00956
Date Filed2022-04-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Charlene Edwards Honeywell
PlaintiffCarlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.
Case DescriptionCarlton Hooker submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning a police investigation report pertaining to an incident in which he was unlawfully detained by VA police. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency located responsive records but refused to disclose them. Hooker filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hooker filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [14]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-221COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs filed by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (No filing fee paid; No IFP)(BD) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-272NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-273NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-29FEES Paid by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Filing fee $402.00, Receipt Number TPA066367). (ARC) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (JNB). (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-294SUMMONS issued as to Department of Veterans Affairs. (SEG) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-025NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. Related case(s): Yes (BD) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-076NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. Related case(s): Yes (BD) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-077MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (BD) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-188PROOF of Service on 4/30/22 via Priority Mail as to U.S. Attorney's Office by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (BD) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-189PROOF of Service on 5/2/22 via Priority Mail as to Department of Veterans Affairs by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (BD) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-1810PROOF of Service on 5/2/22 via Priority Mail as to U.S. Attorney General by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (BD) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-3111MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to FOIA Complaint by Department of Veterans Affairs. (Harwell, Lacy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-0212ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 1, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/2/2022. (Flynn, Sean) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-0513MOTION to Recuse Judge and Response to 11 Motion for Extension of Time by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(BD) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
2022-06-0814ORDER denying 13 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/8/2022. (Flynn, Sean) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar