Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFRIENDS OF THE EARTH v. COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01128
Date Filed2022-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffFRIENDS OF THE EARTH
Case DescriptionFriends of the Earth submitted a FOIA request to the Council on Environmental Quality for records concerning a report on federal oil and gas leasing program in response to Executive Order 14008. After hearing nothing from the agency, Friends of the Earth filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCOUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-251COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against FRIENDS OF THE EARTH ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9191328) filed by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Friends of the Earth's FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Arnold, Matthew) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH (Arnold, Matthew) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-26Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zsb) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-05-234NOTICE of Appearance by Kyla Marie Snow on behalf of COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY (Snow, Kyla) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-235NOTICE of Appearance by William Stewart Eubanks, II on behalf of FRIENDS OF THE EARTH (Eubanks, William) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-266CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FRIENDS OF THE EARTH . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Arnold, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY served on 5/4/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/2/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/2/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/1/2022.) (See Docket Entry 6 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-06-018ANSWER to Complaint by COUNCIL ON ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY.(Snow, Kyla) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
2022-06-029ORDER setting deadline for parties to submit proposed briefing schedule. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/2/2022. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/24/2022. (tb) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar