Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUS RIGHT TO KNOW v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01130
Date Filed2022-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffUS RIGHT TO KNOW
Case DescriptionUS Right to Know submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the federal government's investigation of the origins of COVID-19. USRTK also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told USRTK that unusual circumstances would prevent it from responding in a timely manner. After hearing nothing further from the agency, USRTK filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-251COMPLAINT against STATE DEPARTMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9191673) filed by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Dept of State, # 5 Exhibit A (FOIA Request), # 6 Exhibit B (Acknowledgement Letter), # 7 Exhibit C (Correspondence))(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-26Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsb) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-272SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-05-203NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-214Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/21/2022)
2022-05-24MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: The Court GRANTS 4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's Answer is now due by June 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on May 24, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar