Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01132
Date Filed2022-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Florence Y. Pan
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for trial exhibits in the trial of the United States v. Couy Griffin, a New Mexico public official, who had been convicted of a lesser charge for participating in the January 6 attack on the Capitol. CREW also asked for a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9192752) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Dep't of Justice, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-27Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zjm) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-274STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 4/27/2022. (lcrl) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-05-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/3/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/2/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/3/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/3/22. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-06-026NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-027ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-038ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report proposing a schedule for litigation of this case on or before June 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 6/3/2022. (lcrl) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/24/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar