Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATO INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01135
Date Filed2022-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffCATO INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cato Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning any mention of the Cato Institute in relation to the implementation of the Jones Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Cato Institute that it was processing the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cato Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9193464) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A-C, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-252NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-253NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-04-26Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmh) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-264SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-275STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 27, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-05-036REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney's Office For D.C. filed by CATO INSTITUTE.(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-047SUMMONS (1) Re-Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (zeg) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 5/11/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-269RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/12/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar