Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWP COMPANY LLC v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01138
Date Filed2022-04-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffWP COMPANY LLC
doing business as WASHINGTON POST
Case DescriptionThe Washington Post submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning the CIA histories requested by the Church Committee during its investigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Washington Post filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-261COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9194143) filed by WP COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons to CIA, # 5 Summons to Atty. Gen., # 6 Summons to U.S. Atty.)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WP COMPANY LLC (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-263ERRATA - Complaint Ex. C by WP COMPANY LLC re 1 Complaint, filed by WP COMPANY LLC. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-27Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-274SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-05-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/28/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/28/2022. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 4/29/2022 (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-047RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/29/2022. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-168NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-319ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-01MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before June 15, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/01/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar