Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01140
Date Filed2022-04-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Americans for Prosperity Foundation submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records reflecting the results of the Known Employer's Pilot. AFPF also requested a fee waiver and inclusion in the new media preferential category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. USCIS told AFPF that its request was 1577 of 1653 pending requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AFPF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-261COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9195387) filed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 10 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen., # 11 Summons USCIS)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-26Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-284REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (Corrected Summons for Civil Process Clerk) filed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION.(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-285SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (zeg) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-05-026STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 2, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/2/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/1/2022. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-108NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Bolinder on behalf of AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-279RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/11/2022. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-2710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 5/10/2022 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-3111ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar