Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGREENSPAN v. U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01153
Date Filed2022-04-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffAARON GREENSPAN
Case DescriptionAaron Greenspan submitted five FOIA requests to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning the Tesla investigation and a variety of other unrelated topics. The agency acknowledged the receipt of the requests. The agency denied the Tesla request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). After the agency failed to respond to the other requests, Greenspan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-261COMPLAINT against U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9197140) filed by AARON GREENSPAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-12, # 2 Exhibit Ex 13-24, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-262NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of AARON GREENSPAN (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-263NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of AARON GREENSPAN (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 04/26/2022)
2022-04-27Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (znmg) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-274SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-05-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 5/11/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/12/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar