Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01164
Date Filed2022-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionElectronic Frontier Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning records identified as potentially responsive to an earlier case. EFF also requested inclusion in the news media fee category and a public interest fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told EFF that its request fell in the unusual circumstances category. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9198676) filed by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Mackey, Aaron) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-272NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-2689. (Mackey, Aaron) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-273LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION (Mackey, Aaron) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-28Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (znmg) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-284SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-05-025NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Sobel on behalf of ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION (Sobel, David) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-046ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Mackey, Aaron); Modified on 5/5/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-05NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Notice (Other); emailed to amackey@eff.org, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed , 2. Incorrect event used. Please refile using the correct event under "Service of Process." Modified text on 5/5/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/28/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/28/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Mackey, Aaron) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/3/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Mackey, Aaron) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-059RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/03/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Mackey, Aaron) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-3110NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-3111Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-31MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that, for good cause shown, Defendant's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's complaint by June 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/31/2022. (lctjk1) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-0712ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-08MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by July 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 06/08/2022. (lctjk2) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar