Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01167
Date Filed2022-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the CIA and the Department of State for records concerning communications of various senior officials. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-271COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9199547) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons as to US Attorney, # 5 Summons as to Attorney General, # 6 Summons as to Central Intelligence Agency, # 7 Summons as to U.S. Department of State)(Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-29Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-293SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-034ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/3/2022. (DM) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-315RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 5/9/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/9/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/09/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/25/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/24/2022.) (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar