Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01173
Date Filed2022-04-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionProfessionals Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the development of the Office of Pollution Prevention and Toxics development of the working definition referenced on the EPA's "Per- and Polyfluroalkyl Substances (PFAS) in Pesticide Packaging. PEER also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted PEER's request for a fee waiver. The agency then told PEER that its request qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing anything further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-281COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9201115) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for EPA, # 3 Summons Summons for US AG, # 4 Summons Summons for US Att DC)(Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-28Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-284STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/28/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-05-315ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-02MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceedings in this matter. The report should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the report on or before July 8, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/2/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar