Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01176
Date Filed2022-04-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning waivers or impartiality determinations issued to political appointees of the Biden administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
725 17th Street NW
Washington, DC 20503
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-281COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9201469) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA 21-312, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons -- OMB)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-29Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-292SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-313NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Murray Tulis on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-314ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-05-31MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/31/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-145Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-06-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 5 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before September 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/16/2022. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar