Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICANS FOR FAIR TREATMENT v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01183
Date Filed2022-04-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffAMERICANS FOR FAIR TREATMENT
Case DescriptionAmericans for Fair Treatment submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Postal Service for records concerning the agency's Privacy Act statement allowing the agency to disclose personal information to third parties on antigen tests for COVID-19 where required by law. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told AFT that it had no responsive records. AFT filed an administrative appeal. The agency affirmed its no records response but told AFT that its Privacy Act statement was meant to comply with the E-Government Act. AFT then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
DefendantLOUIS DEJOY in his official capacity as Postmaster General of the United States Postal Service
DefendantTHOMAS J. MARSHALL in his official capacity as General Counsel of the United States Postal Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-281COMPLAINT against LOUIS DEJOY, THOMAS J. MARSHALL, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9203043) filed by AMERICANS FOR FAIR TREATMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons United States Postal Service, # 12 Summons Louis DeJoy, # 13 Summons Thomas J. Marshall, # 14 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 15 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Dorey, David) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-29Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zjm) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-292SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-163RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LOUIS DEJOY served on 5/9/2022; THOMAS J. MARSHALL served on 5/9/2022; UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE served on 5/9/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipts)(Dorey, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/9/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/8/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipts)(Dorey, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/9/22. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipts)(Dorey, David) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-196MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tessa E. Shurr, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9248480. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICANS FOR FAIR TREATMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorey, David) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-277ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/27/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-06-028NOTICE of Appearance by Tessa Elizabeth Shurr on behalf of AMERICANS FOR FAIR TREATMENT (Shurr, Tessa) (Entered: 06/02/2022)
2022-06-089NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of All Defendants (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-06-0810ANSWER to Complaint by LOUIS DEJOY, THOMAS J. MARSHALL, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar