Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01188
Date Filed2022-04-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffGANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC
doing business as USA TODAY
Case DescriptionUSA Today submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning the Emergency Use Authorization application by Vivera Pharmaceuticals for its COVx-RT Test. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, USA Today filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Choice of format, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-291COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9204032) filed by GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons to Atty. General, # 5 Summons to U.S. Atty, # 6 Summons to FDA)(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-29Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-292SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-023STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 29, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-114NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Kelley on behalf of GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-235NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-236Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless), GRANTING defendant's 6 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint; and EXTENDING, until July 6, 2022, the time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 23, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 7/6/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar