Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEFENDING RIGHTS & DISSENT v. NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01194
Date Filed2022-04-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffDEFENDING RIGHTS & DISSENT
Case DescriptionDefending Rights & Dissent submitted FOIA requests to the National Geospatial Intelligence Agency, the FBI, the Department of Justice, and the National Security Agency for records concerning investigations resulting from The Intercept publishing information about U.S. terror watch list in July and August 2014. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The FBI denied the request because it did not adequately describe searchable records. The NSA denied the request under Exemption 1 (national security). The NGA and the DOJ both told DRD that it was searching for records. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, DRD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
935 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20535
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-291COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9204893) filed by DEFENDING RIGHTS & DISSENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-8, # 2 Exhibit Ex 9-17, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-292NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of DEFENDING RIGHTS & DISSENT (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-293NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of DEFENDING RIGHTS & DISSENT (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-02Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjm) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-024SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjm). (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-06-035NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of All Defendants (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-076Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar