Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFAMILY HEALTHCARE NETWORK v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01196
Date Filed2022-04-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffFAMILY HEALTHCARE NETWORK
Case DescriptionFamily Healthcare Network submitted FOIA requests to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning licensing determination for various rural health clinic. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told FHN that it located 494 pages of responsive record as to one application. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, FHN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-291COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9205025) filed by FAMILY HEALTHCARE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Waters, Edward) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-02Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmh) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-02NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to ewaters@ftlf.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue. (zmh, ) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-022REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by FAMILY HEALTHCARE NETWORK. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by FAMILY HEALTHCARE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Waters, Edward) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-023ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) Modified on 5/11/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-11NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 3 Summons Issued Electronically. The following error(s) need correction: Other - Incorrect summonses were issued. Please refile correct FOIA summonses to be reissued. (znmw) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-164REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by FAMILY HEALTHCARE NETWORK. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by FAMILY HEALTHCARE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Waters, Edward) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-165SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (CMS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar