Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01200
Date Filed2022-04-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and the Department of Agriculture for records concerning communications and correspondence discussing or mentioning revision of the Cottonwood statutory language under Section 7 of the Endangered Species Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DefendantU.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantOFFICE OF THE SECRETARY U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9205250) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Interior, # 3 Summons AG, # 4 Summons FWS, # 5 Summons USADC, # 6 Summons USDA, # 7 Declaration Corporate Disclosure Certificate)(Snape, William) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-292MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephanie Kurose, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9205376. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Snape, William) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-293LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (zsb) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-03Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-034SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-03MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie Kurose. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/3/2022. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-095NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Kurose on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Kurose, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY served on 5/16/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 5/16/2022; U.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 5/16/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/16/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/16/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/15/2022.) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service to Federal Defendants, U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney)(Kurose, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar