Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGaines v. Commissioner of Social Security
DistrictSouthern District of Illinois
CityEast St. Louis
Case Number3:2022cv00880
Date Filed2022-04-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison
PlaintiffBrent Gaines
Case DescriptionBrent Gaines submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning agreements the agency has with employment networks. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gaines filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantCommissioner of Social Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-04-291COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4773485.), filed by BRENT GAINES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaines, Brent) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-292Summons Requested. (Gaines, Brent) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-293NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Brent Gaines. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf . All future documents must bear case number 22-cv-880-GCS. Consent due by 5/20/2022 (kek) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-294NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Brent Gaines does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-295Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Attorney Gaines. (kek) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-236NOTICE: Brent Gaines was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Brent Gaines shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 5/31/2022 (kek) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-277CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Gaines, Brent) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar