Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATO INSTITUTE v. U.S. SECRET SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01224
Date Filed2022-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffCATO INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cato Institute submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning intelligence reports that mentioned the terms "anarchist," "anti-fascists", or "Youth Liberation Front." The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told the Cato Institute the request was too broad to search. The Cato Institute filed an administrative appeal, arguing that the request was not too broad. The agency agreed to search a narrowed request but indicated it would need to review thousands of files to conduct a search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cato Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. SECRET SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9209073) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-10, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-022NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-023NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-034SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-035STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/3/22. (lctnm2) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SECRET SERVICE served on 5/11/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/11/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/12/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar