Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv03590
Date Filed2022-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge J. Paul Oetken
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
Case DescriptionThe New York Times submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the FBI Behavior Analysis Unit's report that found that Havana Syndrome was a mass psychosis/functional illness. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told the New York Times that its request would take 1,929 days to complete. The New York Times then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-041COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26098288)Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-042NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sum Yi Jessica Hui on behalf of The New York Times Company..(Hui, Sum Yi Jessica) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-043CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-044REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-045RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-05CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-05Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-05Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-056ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (vf) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-257NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Schessler Poscablo on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-06-038ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation..(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-079ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear telephonically for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 7, 2022, at 2:30 p.m. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Initial Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/7/2022) (ate) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar