Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01245
Date Filed2022-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted three FOIA requests to U.S. Geological Survey for records concerning James Applegate's April 19, 2021 response to PEER Senior Counsel Peter Jenkins regarding a multi-NGO letter pertaining to the accreditation of USGS's wildlife disease laboratories. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-051COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9216668) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for USGS, # 3 Summons Summons for US AG, # 4 Summons Summons for US Att DC)(Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-06Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmh) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-124STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 12, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
2022-05-195CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY . (Kingston, Hudson) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-197RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY served on 5/18/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/13/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/9/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/8/2022.) (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (zeg) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-206NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-05-26NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Certificate of Service; emailed to hkingston@peer.org, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Notice of Corrected Docket Entry: Your entry has been modified as a courtesy. Please note the appropriate reminders for future filings; do not refile document, 2. Incorrect event used (zeg, ) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-06-088ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES GEOLOGICAL SURVEY.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar