Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01246
Date Filed2022-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning meeting calendars and travel logs for Secretary Mayorkas. PPT also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted PPT's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9216743) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA 2022-HQFO-00365, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - DHS)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-06Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmh) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-062SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-123STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 12, 2022. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
2022-06-064NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
2022-06-065MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar