Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBROCKMAN v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv01254
Date Filed2022-05-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Florence Y. Pan
PlaintiffROBERT T. BROCKMAN
Case DescriptionRobert Brockman submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning notices of jeopardy assessments and tax liens pertaining to him. He also asked for expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed the records in encrypted form and sent Brockman and key to decrypt the files. Brockman contended the key did not work and without further information from the agency he could not contest the tax assessments. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Brockman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-061COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9220062) filed by ROBERT T. BROCKMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bleustein, Irina) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-062SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ROBERT T. BROCKMAN(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Bleustein, Irina) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-09Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (znmg) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-104STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/10/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-105MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathryn Keneally, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9225394. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROBERT T. BROCKMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bleustein, Irina) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-106MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Frank J. Jackson, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9225487. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROBERT T. BROCKMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bleustein, Irina) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-107MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Scarduzio, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9225540. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROBERT T. BROCKMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bleustein, Irina) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-108MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anthony J. DeRiso, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9225561. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROBERT T. BROCKMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bleustein, Irina) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-10MINUTE ORDER granting 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Kathryn Keneally is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff Robert T. Brockman. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/10/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-10MINUTE ORDER granting 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Frank J. Jackson is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff Robert T. Brockman. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/10/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-10MINUTE ORDER granting 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Michael J. Scarduzio is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff Robert T. Brockman. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/10/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-10MINUTE ORDER granting 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Anthony J. DeRiso is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff Robert T. Brockman. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/10/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-119NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Scarduzio on behalf of ROBERT T. BROCKMAN (Scarduzio, Michael ) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-1110NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph DeRiso, III on behalf of ROBERT T. BROCKMAN (DeRiso, Anthony) (Entered: 05/11/2022)
2022-05-1211NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Jackson on behalf of ROBERT T. BROCKMAN (Jackson, Frank) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
2022-05-1212NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Keneally on behalf of ROBERT T. BROCKMAN (Keneally, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
2022-05-2313RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/16/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/15/2022. (Bleustein, Irina) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-2314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/16/2022. (Bleustein, Irina) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-2315NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran O'Neill Carter on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-06-0616RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 5/16/2022 (Bleustein, Irina) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar