Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKoch et al. v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2022cv03712
Date Filed2022-05-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul A. Engelmayer
PlaintiffWilliam I. Koch
PlaintiffBradley Goldstein
Case DescriptionWilliam Koch and Bradley Goldstein, a writer specializing in wine, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the investigation of Rudy Kruniawan. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied it in full under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Koch and Goldstein filed an administrative appeal. EOUSA denied the appeal. Koch and Goldstein then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [10]
Opinion/Order [12]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-05-061COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26114007)Document filed by William I. Koch, Bradley Goldstein. (Clopper, John) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-062CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clopper, John) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-063REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Bradley Goldstein, William I. Koch..(Clopper, John) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-09CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(gp) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-09Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (gp) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-09Case Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-094ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Justice..(gp) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-10NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Lewis J. Liman is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-06-165CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Stephen Cha-Kim dated 6/16/22. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice..(Cha-Kim, Stephen) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-166ORDER: granting 5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 5 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Stephen Cha-Kim dated 6/16/22. Granted. SO ORDERED. U.S. Department of Justice answer due 7/1/2022. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/16/2022) (ama) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-07-017ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice..(Cha-Kim, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-058NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access.Code 468-4906, followed by the pound(#) key. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/2/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/5/2022) (jca) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-279JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Stephen Cha-Kim dated 7/27/2022 re: Status Report Prior to Initial Conference. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice..(Cha-Kim, Stephen) (Entered: 07/27/2022)
2022-08-02Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/2/2022. (ajs) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-0310ORDER: As consented to by the parties in the pretrial conference on August 2, 2022, the Court instructs the parties to submit a joint status update outlining the status of the case as to all parties on October 3, 2022, and thereafter on the first Monday of each month. The Court appreciates the parties' cooperation thus far in moving this matter forward. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/3/2022) (va) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-10-0411LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Update addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Stephen Cha-Kim dated 10/4/2022. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice..(Cha-Kim, Stephen) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-0412ORDER granting 11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/4/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
2022-10-0613STATUS REPORT. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice..(Cha-Kim, Stephen) (Entered: 10/06/2022)
2022-10-1114MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 13 Status Report filed by U.S. Department of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update from the parties and is hopeful that the next joint letter, due on November 7, 2022, indicates substantial progress in production. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/11/2022) (tg) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-11-0715STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report re FOIA Processing Document filed by Bradley Goldstein, William I. Koch..(Clopper, John) (Entered: 11/07/2022)
2022-11-0916MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 15 Status Report filed by Bradley Goldstein, William I. Koch ENDORSEMENT: The Court orders the parties to confer regarding a per month processing rate and file a joint letter by November 14, 2022, alerting to a consensus figure. The Court strongly urges the parties to work collaboratively to determine a rate that is both feasible and brisk. In the event that the parties cannot come to an agreement, they should notify the Court in a joint letter by that same date, at which point the Court will set a briefing schedule for the issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/9/2022) (ks) (Entered: 11/09/2022)
2022-11-1417STATUS REPORT. Regarding FOIA Processing Rate Document filed by Bradley Goldstein, William I. Koch..(Clopper, John) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
2022-11-1518MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 17 Status Report filed by Bradley Goldstein, William I. Koch. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates the parties' efforts to work collaboratively to make progress on production. The next status letter is due on January 6, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/15/2022) (va) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar